Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1022 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2015

                    By: Moody, Martinez Fischer, Bonnen of Galveston H.B. No. 1022
 (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 14, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 14,
 Nays 0; May 14, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility for an exemption from ad valorem
 taxation of the residence homestead of certain persons with a life
 estate in the homestead property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.13(j)(1), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (1)  "Residence homestead" means a structure
 (including a mobile home) or a separately secured and occupied
 portion of a structure (together with the land, not to exceed 20
 acres, and improvements used in the residential occupancy of the
 structure, if the structure and the land and improvements have
 identical ownership) that:
 (A)  is owned by one or more individuals, either
 directly or through a beneficial interest in a qualifying trust;
 (B)  is designed or adapted for human residence;
 (C)  is used as a residence; and
 (D)  is occupied as the individual's principal
 residence by an owner, by an owner's surviving spouse who has a life
 estate in the property, or, for property owned through a beneficial
 interest in a qualifying trust, by a trustor or beneficiary of the
 trust who qualifies for the exemption.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to an ad valorem tax year
 that begins on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *