By: Turner of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 1101 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015; May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 13, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to extending the period over which the balance of the system benefit fund is to be eliminated. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 39.903(m), Utilities Code, is amended to read as follows: (m) This section expires September 1, 2017 [2016]. SECTION 2. Section 39.9039, Utilities Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 39.9039. ELIMINATION OF SYSTEM BENEFIT FUND BALANCE. (a) Notwithstanding Section 39.903(b), the commission shall set the nonbypassable system benefit fund fee at the amount of zero cents per megawatt hour for the period beginning September 1, 2013, and ending September 1, 2017 [2016]. (b) Notwithstanding Section 39.903(e), money in the system benefit fund may be appropriated: (1) [for the state fiscal year beginning September 1, 2013, a program established by the commission to assist low-income electric customers by providing a reduced rate for the months of September, 2013, and May through August, 2014, in the manner prescribed by Section 39.903(h) at a rate of up to 82 percent; [(2)] for the state fiscal year beginning September 1, 2014, to a program established by the commission to assist low-income electric customers by providing a reduced rate for the months of September, 2014, and May through August, 2015, in the manner prescribed by Section 39.903(h), at a rate of up to 15 percent; (2) [(3)] for the state fiscal year beginning September 1, 2015, to a program established by the commission to assist low-income electric customers by providing a reduced rate for the months of September, 2015, [and May] through August, 2016, in the manner prescribed by Section 39.903(h), at the [a] rate the commission determines is necessary to exhaust the system benefit fund [of up to 15 percent]; (3) for the state fiscal year beginning September 1, 2016, if any money remains in the fund, to a program established by the commission to assist low-income electric customers by providing a reduced rate for the months of September, 2016, through August, 2017, in the manner prescribed by Section 39.903(h), at the rate the commission determines is necessary to exhaust the system benefit fund; and (4) for customer education programs and administrative expenses incurred by the commission in implementing and administering this chapter. (c) This section expires September 1, 2017 [2016]. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *