By: Hernandez (Senate Sponsor - Garcia) H.B. No. 1119 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015; May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a study assessing the statewide need for the replacement of mile markers on certain highways. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) The Texas Department of Transportation, in consultation with the Texas A&M Transportation Institute, shall conduct a study assessing the statewide need for the replacement of fallen or damaged mile markers on interstate highways where mile markers are required to be installed under state or federal guidelines. (b) Not later than January 1, 2017, the department shall submit a report on the results of the study and any recommendations to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officer of each standing committee of the legislature with jurisdiction over transportation matters. (c) This Act expires August 31, 2017. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *