Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1119 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2015

                    By: Hernandez (Senate Sponsor - Garcia) H.B. No. 1119
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study assessing the statewide need for the
 replacement of mile markers on certain highways.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) The Texas Department of Transportation, in
 consultation with the Texas A&M Transportation Institute, shall
 conduct a study assessing the statewide need for the replacement of
 fallen or damaged mile markers on interstate highways where mile
 markers are required to be installed under state or federal
 guidelines.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2017, the department shall
 submit a report on the results of the study and any recommendations
 to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house
 of representatives, and the presiding officer of each standing
 committee of the legislature with jurisdiction over transportation
 matters.
 (c)  This Act expires August 31, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *