Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1151 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Thompson of Harris, Collier, Harless H.B. No. 1151
 (Senate Sponsor - Garcia)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources and Economic Development; May 22, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 22, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to sexual harassment protection for unpaid interns.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 21, Labor Code, is amended
 by adding Section 21.1065 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.1065.  SEXUAL HARASSMENT PROTECTIONS FOR UNPAID
 INTERNS. (a) In this section, "sexual harassment" means an
 unwelcome sexual advance, a request for a sexual favor, or any other
 verbal or physical conduct of a sexual nature if:
 (1)  submission to the advance, request, or conduct is
 made a term or condition of an individual's internship, either
 explicitly or implicitly;
 (2)  submission to or rejection of the advance,
 request, or conduct by an individual is used as the basis for a
 decision affecting the individual's internship;
 (3)  the advance, request, or conduct has the purpose
 or effect of unreasonably interfering with an individual's work
 performance at the individual's internship; or
 (4)  the advance, request, or conduct has the purpose
 or effect of creating an intimidating, hostile, or offensive
 working environment.
 (b)  An employer commits an unlawful employment practice if
 sexual harassment of an unpaid intern occurs and the employer or the
 employer's agents or supervisors:
 (1)  know or should have known that the conduct
 constituting sexual harassment was occurring; and
 (2)  fail to take immediate and appropriate corrective
 action.
 (c)  In this section, an individual is considered to be an
 unpaid intern of an employer if:
 (1)  the individual's internship, even though it
 includes engagement in the employer's operations or the performance
 of productive work for the employer, is similar to training that
 would be given in an educational environment;
 (2)  the individual's internship experience is for the
 individual's benefit;
 (3)  the individual does not displace the employer's
 regular employees but works under close supervision of the
 employer's existing staff;
 (4)  the employer does not derive any immediate
 advantage from the individual's internship activities and on
 occasion the employer's operations may be impeded by those
 activities;
 (5)  the individual is not entitled to a job at the
 conclusion of the internship; and
 (6)  the individual is not entitled to wages for the
 time spent in the internship.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a claim of discrimination based on conduct that occurs on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A claim of discrimination
 that is based on conduct that occurs before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the conduct
 occurred, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *