Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1152 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/05/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R197 TJB-D
 By: Turner of Collin H.B. No. 1152


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the phaseout and repeal of the franchise tax; lowering
 the rates of the tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) Effective January 1, 2016, Sections
 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as
 provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.75
 [one] percent of taxable margin.
 (b)  Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of
 the franchise tax is 0.38 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those
 taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade.
 (b)  This section applies only to a report originally due on
 or after January 1, 2016.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Effective January 1, 2017, Sections
 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as
 provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.50
 [one] percent of taxable margin.
 (b)  Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of
 the franchise tax is 0.25 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those
 taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade.
 (b)  This section applies only to a report originally due on
 or after January 1, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Effective January 1, 2018, Sections
 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as
 provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.25
 [one] percent of taxable margin.
 (b)  Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of
 the franchise tax is 0.13 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those
 taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade.
 (b)  This section applies only to a report originally due on
 or after January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 4.  (a) Effective January 1, 2016, Section
 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that
 elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is
 computed by:
 (1)  determining the taxable entity's total revenue
 from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011;
 (2)  apportioning the amount computed under
 Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to
 determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and
 (3)  multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision
 (2) by the rate of 0.43 [0.575] percent.
 (b)  This section applies only to a report originally due on
 or after January 1, 2016.
 SECTION 5.  (a) Effective January 1, 2017, Section
 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that
 elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is
 computed by:
 (1)  determining the taxable entity's total revenue
 from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011;
 (2)  apportioning the amount computed under
 Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to
 determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and
 (3)  multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision
 (2) by the rate of 0.29 [0.575] percent.
 (b)  This section applies only to a report originally due on
 or after January 1, 2017.
 SECTION 6.  (a) Effective January 1, 2018, Section
 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that
 elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is
 computed by:
 (1)  determining the taxable entity's total revenue
 from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011;
 (2)  apportioning the amount computed under
 Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to
 determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and
 (3)  multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision
 (2) by the rate of 0.14 [0.575] percent.
 (b)  This section applies only to a report originally due on
 or after January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 7.  Section 171.362(f), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (f)  In addition to any other penalty authorized by this
 section, a taxable entity that owes a tax for a reporting period and
 [who] fails to file a report for the reporting period as required by
 this chapter shall pay a penalty of $50.  The penalty provided by
 this subsection is assessed without regard to whether the taxable
 entity subsequently files the report [or whether any taxes were due
 from the taxable entity for the reporting period under the required
 report].
 SECTION 8.  (a)  Chapter 171, Tax Code, is repealed.
 (b)  A taxable entity that is subject to the franchise tax
 imposed under Chapter 171, Tax Code, on December 31, 2018, shall
 file a final franchise tax return and pay a transitional tax as
 required by this subsection on or before May 15, 2019. The
 transitional tax is equal to the tax the taxable entity would have
 paid in 2019 under Chapter 171, Tax Code, if Chapter 171, Tax Code,
 had not been repealed.  The provisions of Chapter 171, Tax Code,
 relating to the computation and payment of the franchise tax remain
 in effect after the repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, by this section
 for the purposes of computing and paying the transitional tax
 required by this subsection.
 (c)  Chapter 171, Tax Code, and Subtitle B, Title 2, Tax
 Code, continue to apply to audits, deficiencies, redeterminations,
 and refunds of any tax due or collected under Chapter 171, including
 the tax due as provided by Subsection (b) of this section, until
 barred by limitations.
 (d)  The repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, does not affect:
 (1)  the status of a taxable entity that has had its
 corporate privileges, certificate of authority, certificate of
 organization, certificate of limited partnership, corporate
 charter, or registration revoked, suit filed against it, or a
 receiver appointed under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter;
 (2)  the ability of the comptroller, secretary of
 state, or attorney general to take action against a taxable entity
 under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter for actions that took
 place before the repeal; or
 (3)  the right of a taxable entity to contest a
 forfeiture, revocation, lawsuit, or appointment of a receiver under
 Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter.
 (e)  This section takes effect January 1, 2019.
 SECTION 9.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act applies only to a report originally due on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 10.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect January 1, 2016.