Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1164 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: VanDeaver, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Garcia) H.B. No. 1164
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 2;
 May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1164 By:  Garcia


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the Texas Education Agency to conduct a study
 to develop a writing assessment method for public school students
 and establish a pilot program to administer the assessment method
 developed.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 39, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.02301 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.02301.  WRITING ASSESSMENT STUDY; PILOT PROGRAM.
 (a) During the 2015-2016 school year, the agency, in coordination
 with the entity that has been contracted to develop or implement
 assessment instruments under Section 39.023, shall conduct a study
 to develop a writing assessment method as an alternative to the
 writing assessment instruments required under Sections 39.023(a)
 and (c). The writing assessment method must be designed to assess:
 (1)  a student's mastery of the essential knowledge and
 skills in writing through timed writing samples;
 (2)  improvement of a student's writing skills from the
 beginning of the school year to the end of the school year;
 (3)  a student's ability to follow the writing process
 from rough draft to final product; and
 (4)  a student's ability to produce more than one type
 of writing style.
 (b)  During the 2016-2017 and 2017-2018 school years, the
 agency shall establish a pilot program as provided by this section
 to implement in designated school districts the writing assessment
 method developed under Subsection (a).
 (c)  The agency shall designate school districts to
 participate in the pilot program as provided by this subsection.
 The pilot program must include at least one large urban district,
 one medium-sized district, and one rural district. Each district
 included must have a student enrollment that is representative of
 diverse demographics and socioeconomic backgrounds. To the extent
 practicable, the agency shall designate the number of districts the
 agency determines appropriate to achieve the cost savings described
 by Subsection (d).
 (d)  A school district designated to participate in the pilot
 program under this section is not required to comply with the
 writing assessment requirements under Sections 39.023(a) and (c)
 during the period the district is participating in the pilot
 program. The agency shall, to the greatest extent practicable,
 apply cost savings that result from the exemption under this
 subsection to offset the costs accrued under this section.
 (e)  The agency shall establish the process for
 consolidating student writing assessments under the method
 developed under Subsection (a) to be submitted for scoring. This
 process may include the submission of a student portfolio for
 scoring.
 (f)  The individuals responsible for scoring student writing
 assessments under the pilot program shall be coordinated jointly
 by:
 (1)  the school district in which the student is
 enrolled and that is participating in the pilot program;
 (2)  a public junior college or institution of higher
 education that enters into an agreement with the participating
 school district; and
 (3)  the regional education service center that serves
 the participating district.
 (g)  A random sampling of scored student writing
 assessments, the size of which the agency shall determine, shall be
 delivered to the agency.
 (h)  Not later than September 1, 2016, the agency shall
 prepare and deliver to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officer
 of each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction
 over primary and secondary education a report covering the study of
 the development of the writing assessment method under Subsection
 (a). Not later than September 1 of each year in 2017 and 2018, the
 agency shall prepare and deliver to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the
 presiding officer of each legislative standing committee with
 primary jurisdiction over primary and secondary education a report
 that:
 (1)  evaluates the implementation and progress of the
 pilot program under this section; and
 (2)  makes recommendations regarding the continuation
 or expansion of the pilot program.
 (i)  The agency shall adopt rules as necessary to administer
 this section.
 (j)  This section expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *