By: Burkett, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 1180 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015; April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; May 7, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 7, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1180 By: Kolkhorst A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to certain information included on a searchable database on the Department of Family and Protective Services' Internet website. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 42, Human Resources Code, is amended by adding Section 42.025 to read as follows: Sec. 42.025. SEARCHABLE DATABASE. (a) The department shall maintain on the department's Internet website a searchable database that includes the name, the address, and any identification number, as applicable, of each family home registered or listed under this chapter that previously had a registration or listing involuntarily suspended or revoked under this chapter with a permanent notation indicating the involuntary suspension or revocation and the year in which the suspension or revocation took effect or was final under this chapter. (b) The executive commissioner may adopt rules as necessary to implement this section. SECTION 2. Not later than December 31, 2015, the Department of Family and Protective Services shall include in a searchable database the information required by Section 42.025, Human Resources Code, as added by this Act, and the involuntary suspension and revocation information on a registered or listed family home for at least the five years preceding the date the information is added to the database. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *