Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1180 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/07/2015

                    By: Burkett, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 1180
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 7, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1180 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain information included on a searchable database
 on the Department of Family and Protective Services' Internet
 website.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 42, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 42.025 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.025.  SEARCHABLE DATABASE.  (a)  The department
 shall maintain on the department's Internet website a searchable
 database that includes the name, the address, and any
 identification number, as applicable, of each family home
 registered or listed under this chapter that previously had a
 registration or listing involuntarily suspended or revoked under
 this chapter with a permanent notation indicating the involuntary
 suspension or revocation and the year in which the suspension or
 revocation took effect or was final under this chapter.
 (b)  The executive commissioner may adopt rules as necessary
 to implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 31, 2015, the Department
 of Family and Protective Services shall include in a searchable
 database the information required by Section 42.025, Human
 Resources Code, as added by this Act, and the involuntary
 suspension and revocation information on a registered or listed
 family home for at least the five years preceding the date the
 information is added to the database.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *