Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1180 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/19/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1180


 AN ACT
 relating to certain information included on a searchable database
 on the Department of Family and Protective Services' Internet
 website.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 42, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 42.025 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.025.  SEARCHABLE DATABASE.  (a)  The department
 shall maintain on the department's Internet website a searchable
 database that includes the name, the address, and any
 identification number, as applicable, of each family home
 registered or listed under this chapter that previously had a
 registration or listing involuntarily suspended or revoked under
 this chapter with a permanent notation indicating the involuntary
 suspension or revocation and the year in which the suspension or
 revocation took effect or was final under this chapter.
 (b)  The executive commissioner may adopt rules as necessary
 to implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 31, 2015, the Department
 of Family and Protective Services shall include in a searchable
 database the information required by Section 42.025, Human
 Resources Code, as added by this Act, and the involuntary
 suspension and revocation information on a registered or listed
 family home for at least the five years preceding the date the
 information is added to the database.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1180 was passed by the House on April
 16, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 1, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1180 on May 18, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 131, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1180 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 15, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor