Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1202 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2015

                    84R25437 AJZ-D
 By: Muñoz, Jr. H.B. No. 1202
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1202:
 By:  González C.S.H.B. No. 1202


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the community nutrition program policy
 advisory council.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 2, Agriculture Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 26 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 26. COMMUNITY NUTRITION PROGRAM POLICY ADVISORY COUNCIL
 Sec. 26.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "advisory
 council" means the community nutrition program policy advisory
 council.
 Sec. 26.002.  ADVISORY COUNCIL ESTABLISHED. The community
 nutrition program policy advisory council is an advisory council
 established to support the goals, initiatives, and policies of the
 department's food and nutrition division.
 Sec. 26.003.  APPOINTMENT OF MEMBERS; TERMS. (a) The
 advisory council is composed of five members appointed by the
 commissioner as follows:
 (1)  two members representing the community
 organizations that contract with the Child and Adult Care Food
 Program, including:
 (A)  one member that provides services to child
 care centers; and
 (B)  one member that provides services to day care
 home providers; and
 (2)  one member representing the community
 organizations that contract with the summer food service program
 under 42 U.S.C. Section 1761;
 (3)  one member representing the community
 organizations that contract with the commodity supplemental food
 program under 7 C.F.R. Part 247; and
 (4)  one member who serves as the president of the Texas
 CACFP Sponsor's Association.
 (b)  In making the appointments required under Subsection
 (a), the commissioner shall:
 (1)  give preference to individuals who are
 professional educators or child care providers, individuals who
 have experience and expertise in an area of interest to the advisory
 council, and individuals who display a commitment to excellence in
 the administration of community nutrition programs; and
 (2)  attempt to appoint a balance of members
 representing business, labor, civic, educational, parental, and
 professional groups, while striving for diversity and geographic
 representation.
 (c)  The commissioner, in consultation with the chief
 administrator of the food and nutrition division of the department,
 shall appoint a chair from among the members. The advisory council
 members may elect a vice chair.
 (d)  Members of the advisory council serve staggered terms of
 three years.
 Sec. 26.004.  DUTIES. (a)  To improve community nutrition
 programs in this state, the advisory council shall:
 (1)  advise the department on policy, rules, and
 program operations, including program recommendations for meeting
 federal or state requirements;
 (2)  advise the department on program materials;
 (3)  identify training priorities for the department;
 (4)  propose solutions to address gaps, flaws,
 inefficiencies, or problems in the state's administration of
 nutrition programs;
 (5)  develop and implement a plan for improving
 relationships between entities that contract with the department
 and other state agencies in connection with the state's nutrition
 policies and programs, including establishing best practices for
 department cooperation and collaboration with entities that
 contract with the department;
 (6)  identify and address duplication of services
 provided by entities that contract with the department; and
 (7)  advise the commissioner and the department's chief
 administrator of food and nutrition on nutrition policy priorities,
 including priorities for the use and allocation of federal money
 and recommendations for the food and nutrition division regarding
 the allocation of federal money.
 (b)  The advisory council shall conduct a review of the
 state's nutrition policies and programs. The advisory council may
 meet with representatives of the state agencies that administer the
 nutrition programs as necessary to conduct the review.
 (c)  The commissioner may direct the advisory council to
 focus the advisory council's efforts in particular areas that will
 inform the efforts of the department.
 Sec. 26.005.  LIAISON. (a) The chief administrator of the
 department's food and nutrition division shall appoint a staff
 member to serve as the advisory council's liaison.
 (b)  The liaison shall:
 (1)  facilitate communications between the advisory
 council and the department;
 (2)  post advisory council meeting notices and other
 information on the advisory council's website; and
 (3)  attend each advisory council meeting.
 Sec. 26.006.  MEETINGS OF ADVISORY COUNCIL. (a) The
 advisory council shall meet at times and locations as determined by
 the chair, not to exceed four meetings per year.
 (b)  Advisory council members may not participate remotely
 in a meeting by telephone conference call, videoconference, or
 other similar telecommunications methods permitted under Chapter
 551, Government Code.
 (c)  The advisory council shall keep minutes of the advisory
 council's meetings and any subcommittee meetings and shall post the
 minutes on the advisory council's website.
 (d)  The chair, in consultation with the liaison, shall
 prepare a meeting agenda, if necessary.
 (e)  The chair may share meeting agendas, minutes, and
 notices with members of the advisory council by telephone, e-mail,
 or fax.
 (f)  The advisory council must maintain advisory council
 records in accordance with state and department record retention
 schedules.
 (g)  Records of the advisory council are public information
 subject to disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 Sec. 26.007.  ANNUAL REPORT. Not later than September 30 of
 each year, the advisory council shall submit an annual report to the
 commissioner on:
 (1)  current issues in the field of community nutrition
 programs relevant to the department's goals and strategic
 initiatives;
 (2)  the advisory council's efforts to support the
 goals and objectives of the department;
 (3)  the advisory council's review of nutrition
 policies and programs conducted under Section 26.004(b); and
 (4)  recommendations for the department, including any
 proposed legislative, rule, or policy changes for improving
 community nutrition programs.
 Sec. 26.008.  REIMBURSEMENT. An advisory council member is
 not entitled to compensation but is entitled to reimbursement for
 travel expenses incurred by the member while conducting the
 business of the advisory council.
 Sec. 26.009.  SUNSET PROVISION. The advisory council is
 subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless
 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the advisory
 council is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2021.
 Sec. 26.010. APPLICABILITY OF OTHER LAW. Chapter 2110,
 Government Code, does not apply to the advisory council.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than October 1, 2015, the commissioner
 of agriculture shall appoint the members of the community nutrition
 program policy advisory council established by Chapter 26,
 Agriculture Code, as added by this Act. In appointing the initial
 members of the advisory council, the commissioner shall appoint two
 persons to terms expiring October 1, 2016, two persons to terms
 expiring October 1, 2017, and one person to a term expiring October
 1, 2018.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.