Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB122 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/12/2015

                    By: Pickett (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 122
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas Mobility Fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 201.943(a) and (l), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Subject to Subsections (e), (f), [and] (g), and (l), the
 commission by order or resolution may issue obligations in the name
 and on behalf of the state and the department and may enter into
 credit agreements related to the obligations. The obligations may
 be issued in multiple series and issues from time to time in an
 aggregate amount not exceeding the maximum obligation amount. The
 obligations may be issued on and may have the terms and provisions
 the commission determines appropriate and in the interests of the
 state. The obligations may be issued as long-term obligations,
 short-term obligations, or both. The latest scheduled maturity of
 an issue or series of obligations may not exceed 30 years.
 (l)  Except as otherwise provided by this subsection,
 obligations [Obligations] may not be issued under this section or
 Section 49-k, Article III, Texas Constitution, after January 1,
 2015 [if the commission or the department requires that toll roads
 be included in a regional mobility plan in order for a local
 authority to receive an allocation from the fund]. The commission
 may issue obligations to refund:
 (1)  outstanding obligations to provide savings to the
 state; and
 (2)  outstanding variable rate obligations and may
 renew or replace credit agreements relating to the variable rate
 obligations.
 SECTION 2.  Section 201.946(d), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  To the extent money is on deposit in the fund in amounts
 that are in excess of the money required by the proceedings
 authorizing the obligations and credit agreements to be retained on
 deposit, the commission may use the money for any purpose for which
 obligations may be issued under this subchapter, other than for
 toll roads.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *