Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1261 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: King of Taylor (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 1261
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 14, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 14,
 Nays 0; May 14, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the comptroller's report on the effect of certain tax
 provisions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 403.014, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  In preparing the report under Subsection (a), if
 actual data is not available, the comptroller shall use available
 statistical data to estimate the effect of an exemption, discount,
 exclusion, special valuation, special accounting treatment,
 special rate, or special method of reporting relating to a tax. If
 the report states that the effect of a particular tax preference
 cannot be determined, the comptroller must include in the report a
 complete explanation of why the comptroller reached that
 conclusion.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *