Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1278 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/23/2015

                    By: Hughes, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 1278
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to financial assistance paid to the survivors of certain
 law enforcement officers, firefighters, and other public employees
 killed in the line of duty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 615.022, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 615.022.  PAYMENT TO SURVIVORS. (a) If there is an
 eligible surviving spouse, the state shall pay $500,000 [$250,000]
 to the eligible surviving spouse.
 (b)  If there is no eligible surviving spouse, the state
 shall pay $500,000 [$250,000] in equal shares to surviving
 children.
 (c)  If there is no eligible surviving spouse or child, the
 state shall pay $500,000 [$250,000] in equal shares to surviving
 parents.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 615.023(a) and (b), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The state shall pay to the duly appointed or qualified
 guardian or other legal representative of an eligible surviving
 minor child:
 (1)  $400 [$200] each month, if there is one surviving
 child;
 (2)  $600 [$300] each month, if there are two surviving
 children; or
 (3)  $800 [$400] each month, if there are three or more
 surviving children.
 (b)  A child's entitlement to assistance payable under this
 section ends on the last day of the month that includes the child's
 18th birthday. At that time, payments to any other surviving minor
 children shall be adjusted, as necessary, to conform to the amounts
 payable under Subsection (a).
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply in
 relation to a payment of assistance made to survivors of certain
 public servants on or after the effective date of this Act
 regardless of the date the death of the public servant occurs.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *