LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB1293
Fiscal Note Draft: Engrossed - February 2, 2025
TX
Texas House Bill HB1293
Overview
Activity Timeline
Authors & Sponsors
Committee Assignments
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
View All
Official Action Record
Meeting Schedule
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1293
Fiscal Note Draft: Engrossed - February 2, 2025
Draft
Fiscal Note Draft: Senate Committee Report - February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note Draft: House Committee Report - February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note Draft: Enrolled - May 21, 2015
Fiscal Note Draft: Comm Sub - May 13, 2015
Fiscal Note Draft: Engrossed - April 30, 2015
Fiscal Note Draft: Comm Sub - April 17, 2015
Fiscal Note Draft: Introduced - February 10, 2015
.pdf
.doc
.html
Fiscal Note Draft: Engrossed - February 2, 2025