Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB13 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/27/2015

                    By: Pickett, Phillips, Martinez, Simmons, H.B. No. 13
 Burkett
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 13:
 By:  Simmons C.S.H.B. No. 13


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to categories of and funding allocation for transportation
 projects by the Texas Department of Transportation and local
 transportation entities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter P, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 201.9901 and 201.9902 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 201.9901.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Planning organization" means:
 (A)  a metropolitan planning organization; or
 (B)  for an area that is not within the boundaries
 of a metropolitan planning organization, the department district
 that serves the area.
 (2)  "Region" means the area for which a planning
 organization develops plans under this subchapter.
 (3)  "Transportation official" means an official in a
 political subdivision who has responsibility for planning and
 implementation of transportation projects.
 Sec. 201.9902.  UPDATE TO TRANSPORTATION FUNDING CATEGORIES
 AND ALLOCATION FORMULAS. (a) Not later than October 1, 2015, the
 commission shall initiate a process to review the categories and
 formulas adopted under Sections 201.991(b)(2) and 201.996.
 (b)  The review process must include an effort by the
 department to seek the collective input of all planning
 organizations in the state. The department shall convene meetings
 as necessary to facilitate discussions among planning
 organizations that will result in a consensus recommendation among
 a majority of the planning organizations as to updated funding
 categories and funding allocation formulas.
 (c)  Not later than May 1, 2016, the commission shall adopt
 rules implementing updated funding categories and funding
 allocation formulas. To the extent that the adopted categories or
 funding allocation formulas differ from the consensus
 recommendations of the planning organizations, the commission must
 provide a detailed written explanation for the differences. The
 explanation must be made available on the department's Internet
 website.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter P, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 201.9911, 201.9921, 201.9931, and
 201.9932 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.9911.  PLANNING ORGANIZATION 10-YEAR PLAN. (a)
 Each planning organization shall develop a 10-year transportation
 plan for the use of the funding allocated to the region. The
 department shall assist the planning organizations by providing in
 a timely manner such information as is reasonably requested by the
 planning organizations.
 (b)  The plan must identify the items described by Section
 201.993(d) as applicable to the planning organization and the
 funding of transportation projects in the region.
 (c)  The first four years of the plan shall be developed to
 meet the transportation improvement plan requirements of 23 U.S.C.
 Section 134 or 135, as applicable.
 (d)  For an area that is not within the boundaries of a
 metropolitan planning organization, the department district shall
 develop the 10-year transportation plan with input from municipal
 and county elected officials and transportation officials in the
 region.
 Sec. 201.9921.  TEN-YEAR CASH FLOW PROJECTION. (a) Not
 later than September 1 of each odd-numbered year, the department's
 chief financial officer shall prepare and publish a cash flow
 forecast for a period of not less than 10 years.
 (b)  The forecast must identify:
 (1)  the aggregate amount of all sources of funding
 available for eligible transportation projects;
 (2)  the amount previously committed to eligible
 transportation projects based on actions of the commission;
 (3)  the amount not committed to projects but that the
 department anticipates allocating during the forecast period
 through formulas adopted under Section 201.996;
 (4)  the amount the department anticipates allocating
 during the forecast period through discretionary decisions of the
 commission; and
 (5)  the sources of all funds projected to be available
 during the forecast period, including bond proceeds, and an
 estimation of debt service payments associated with the bond
 proceeds.
 (c)  The first two years of the forecast must be based on the
 appropriation of funds in the General Appropriations Act for the
 department for that biennium.
 Sec. 201.9931.  PLANNING ORGANIZATION PROJECT SELECTION AND
 PRIORITIZATION. (a) Each planning organization shall select
 projects in its region and prioritize them using the criteria
 developed under Section 201.9932.
 (b)  For an area not located within the boundaries of a
 metropolitan planning organization, the applicable department
 district shall select projects and prioritize them with input from
 municipal and county elected officials and transportation
 officials using the criteria developed under Section 201.9932.
 (c)  The department shall compile the project selections of
 the planning organizations to develop the statewide transportation
 plan in accordance with 23 U.S.C. Section 135.
 Sec. 201.9932.  PROJECT SELECTION CRITERIA. Each planning
 organization shall develop its own project selection criteria,
 which must include consideration of:
 (1)  projected improvements to congestion and safety;
 (2)  projected effects on economic development
 opportunities for residents of the region;
 (3)  available funding, including locally generated
 funding;
 (4)  effects on the environment, including air quality;
 (5)  socioeconomic effects; and
 (6)  any other factors deemed appropriate by the
 planning organization.
 SECTION 3.  Section 201.996, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Before transferring funds between categories by any
 method outside the established formulas or before transferring
 funds subject to discretion of the department, the commission shall
 hold a public hearing on the transfer of those funds. Not later
 than the 30th day before the date of a hearing held under this
 section, the commission shall provide a written explanation of the
 transfer, including the need and justification for the deviation
 from the formula allocation or use of discretionary funds.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter P, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 201.9961 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.9961.  USE OF ADDITIONAL REVENUE AND BOND PROCEEDS
 FOR CERTAIN PROJECTS. (a) If money from the general revenue fund
 or state highway fund is appropriated to the department for the
 state fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2015, in an amount
 that exceeds the appropriation from those funds to the department
 for the previous fiscal biennium, or if a constitutional amendment
 providing additional money to the department is adopted, the
 commission may use the additional money to finance projects that
 would otherwise be financed using proceeds from:
 (1)  the sale and issuance of bonds and other public
 securities secured by the state highway fund under Section 49-n,
 Article III, Texas Constitution, as proposed by H.J.R. 28, 78th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2003; or
 (2)  general obligation bonds issued under Section
 49-p, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 (b)  The commission shall determine whether the unused
 proceeds from bonds described by Subsection (a) may be used to
 finance projects, in addition to those allocated funding under
 Section 201.996, that reduce congestion, increase capacity, reduce
 tolls, or promote safety. The commission shall adopt rules
 establishing criteria for projects to be considered eligible for
 financing under this subsection.
 (c)  Not later than the 30th day before the date the
 commission authorizes the use of money under this section, the
 commission shall hold a public meeting to consider that
 authorization.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.