Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1305 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bonnen of Galveston, Paul H.B. No. 1305
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 19, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1305 By:  Taylor of Galveston


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 LucioX
 BettencourtX
 CampbellX
 GarciaX
 HuffinesX
 KolkhorstX
 RodríguezX
 SeligerX
 TaylorofCollinX
 WestX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a program to provide a free or reduced-price breakfast
 to eligible students attending a public school and the method of
 determining the number of educationally disadvantaged students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.901, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  If at least 10 percent of the students enrolled in one or
 more schools in a school district or enrolled in an open-enrollment
 charter school are eligible for free or reduced-price breakfasts
 under the national school breakfast program provided for by the
 Child Nutrition Act of 1966 (42 U.S.C. Section 1773), the board of
 trustees of the school district or the governing body of the
 open-enrollment charter school shall either:
 (1)  participate in the national program and make the
 benefits of the national program available to all eligible students
 in the schools or school; or
 (2)  develop and implement a locally funded program to
 provide free meals, including breakfast and lunch, to each student
 eligible for free meals under federal law and reduced-price meals,
 including breakfast and lunch, to each student eligible for
 reduced-price meals under federal law, provided that the reduced
 price may not exceed the maximum allowable rate under federal law.
 (a-1)  A school district is permitted under Subsection (a) to
 participate in the national program at one or more campuses in the
 district and provide a locally funded program at one or more other
 campuses in the district.
 (b)  A school district campus or an open-enrollment charter
 school participating in the national school breakfast program
 provided by the Child Nutrition Act of 1966 (42 U.S.C. Section 1773)
 or providing a locally funded program in which 80 percent or more of
 the students qualify under the national program for a free or
 reduced-price breakfast shall offer a free breakfast to each
 student.
 SECTION 2.  Section 42.152(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  For purposes of this section, the number of
 educationally disadvantaged students is determined:
 (1)  by averaging the best six months' numbers of
 students eligible for enrollment in the national school lunch
 program of free or reduced-price lunches for the preceding school
 year; or
 (2)  in the manner provided by commissioner rule[, if
 no campus in the district participated in the national school lunch
 program of free or reduced-price lunches during the preceding
 school year].
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2015-2016
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *