Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1329 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Naishtat (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1329
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment of costs incurred by the involuntary
 commitment of persons with mental illness.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 571.018(a) and (b), Health and Safety
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The costs for a hearing or proceeding under this
 subtitle shall be paid by:
 (1)  the county in which [that initiates] emergency
 detention procedures are initiated under Subchapter A or B, Chapter
 573; or
 (2)  if no emergency detention procedures are
 initiated, the county that accepts an application for court-ordered
 mental health services, issues an order for protective custody, or
 issues an order for temporary mental health services.
 (b)  The county responsible for the costs of a hearing or
 proceeding under Subsection (a) shall pay the costs of all
 subsequent hearings or proceedings for that person under this
 subtitle until the person is discharged from mental health
 services. The county may not pay the costs from any fees collected
 under Section 51.704, Government Code. The costs shall be billed by
 the clerk of the court conducting the hearings.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *