Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1338 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1338


 AN ACT
 relating to training for peace officers and first responders on
 certain persons affected by trauma.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 1701.261 and 1701.262 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 1701.261.  ACQUIRED AND TRAUMATIC BRAIN INJURIES
 TRAINING. (a)  In this section, "first responder" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 421.095, Government Code.
 (b)  The commission, in collaboration with the office of
 acquired brain injury of the Health and Human Services Commission
 and the Texas Traumatic Brain Injury Advisory Council, shall
 establish and maintain a training program for peace officers and
 first responders that provides information on:
 (1)  the effects of an acquired brain injury and of a
 traumatic brain injury; and
 (2)  techniques to interact with persons who have an
 acquired brain injury or a traumatic brain injury.
 Sec 1701.262. TRAUMA AFFECTED VETERANS TRAINING. (a) In
 this section, "veteran" means a person who has served in:
 (1)  the army, navy, air force, coast guard, or marine
 corps of the United States; or
 (2)  the Texas National Guard as defined by Section
 431.001, Government Code.
 (b)  The commission, in collaboration with the Texas
 Veterans Commission, shall establish and maintain a training
 program for peace officers that provides information on veterans
 with combat-related trauma, post-traumatic stress, post-traumatic
 stress disorder, or a traumatic brain injury. An officer may not
 complete the training under this subsection by taking an online
 course.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 31, 2015, the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall approve the curriculum for the
 training programs described by Sections 1701.261 and 1701.262,
 Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1338 was passed by the House on May 5,
 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 1, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1338 on May 26, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 3,
 3 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1338 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor