Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1364 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2015

                    By: Miller of Fort Bend H.B. No. 1364
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1364 By:  Taylor of Collin


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates to honor
 recipients of the Defense Meritorious Service Medal and the
 Meritorious Service Medal.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.315, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsections (j) and (k) to read as follows:
 (j)  The department shall issue specialty license plates for
 recipients of the Defense Meritorious Service Medal.  License
 plates issued under this subsection must include the Defense
 Meritorious Service Medal emblem and must include the words
 "Defense Meritorious Service Medal" at the bottom of each plate.
 (k)  The department shall issue specialty license plates for
 recipients of the Meritorious Service Medal.  License plates issued
 under this subsection must include the Meritorious Service Medal
 emblem and must include the words "Meritorious Service Medal" at
 the bottom of each plate.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *