Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1417 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Elkins (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1417
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 13, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 13, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to peace officer identification cards.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 614.127, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 614.127.  LOST OR STOLEN CARDS. If an identification
 card issued under this subchapter is lost or stolen, the law
 enforcement agency or other governmental entity that issued
 [issuing] the card to the peace officer, reserve law enforcement
 officer, or honorably retired peace officer shall issue a duplicate
 identification card to the officer if the [may:
 [(1)     require a peace officer, reserve law enforcement
 officer, or honorably retired peace] officer submits [to submit] an
 affidavit executed by the [peace officer, reserve law enforcement
 officer, or honorably retired peace] officer to the law enforcement
 agency or other governmental entity [issuing the card] stating that
 the identification card was lost or stolen[; and
 [(2)     issue a duplicate identification card to the
 peace officer, reserve law enforcement officer, or honorably
 retired peace officer].
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 614, Government Code, as
 added by Chapter 1187 (H.B. 638), Acts of the 80th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2007, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *