Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1443 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1443
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015;
 April 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; April 29, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 29, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas Identification Number system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 403.039(a) and (b), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The comptroller shall assign a Texas Identification
 Number[, based on the comptroller's taxpayer identification number
 system,] to each person[, other than a state employee,] who
 supplies property or services to the state for compensation or
 reimbursement.
 (b)  The Texas Identification Number system shall be used by
 each state agency as the primary identification system for
 persons[, other than state employees,] who supply property or
 services to the agency for compensation or reimbursement. The
 agency may assign secondary numbers if the secondary numbering
 system does not unnecessarily create duplication of data bases,
 efforts, or costs.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *