Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1463 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2015

                    By: Raymond (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 1463
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Finance; May 15, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 14, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1463 By:  Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedure for canceling an exemption from ad
 valorem taxation of the residence homestead of an individual who is
 65 years of age or older.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1.07(d), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (d)  A notice required by Section 11.43(q), 11.45(d),
 23.44(d), 23.46(c), 23.54(e), 23.541(c), 23.55(e), 23.57(d),
 23.76(e), 23.79(d), or 23.85(d) must be sent by certified mail.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.43, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subsections (c) and (h) and adding Subsection (q) to read as
 follows:
 (c)  An exemption provided by Section 11.13, 11.131, 11.132,
 11.17, 11.18, 11.182, 11.1827, 11.183, 11.19, 11.20, 11.21, 11.22,
 11.23(h), (j), or (j-1), 11.231, 11.254, 11.271, 11.29, 11.30,
 11.31, or 11.315, once allowed, need not be claimed in subsequent
 years, and except as otherwise provided by Subsection (e), the
 exemption applies to the property until it changes ownership or the
 person's qualification for the exemption changes. However, the
 chief appraiser may require a person allowed one of the exemptions
 in a prior year to file a new application to confirm the person's
 current qualification for the exemption by delivering a written
 notice that a new application is required, accompanied by an
 appropriate application form, to the person previously allowed the
 exemption. If the person previously allowed the exemption is 65
 years of age or older, the chief appraiser may not cancel the
 exemption due to the person's failure to file the new application
 unless the chief appraiser complies with the requirements of
 Subsection (q), if applicable.
 (h)  If the chief appraiser learns of any reason indicating
 that an exemption previously allowed should be canceled, the chief
 appraiser [he] shall investigate. Subject to Subsection (q), if the
 chief appraiser [If he] determines that the property should not be
 exempt, the chief appraiser [he] shall cancel the exemption and
 deliver written notice of the cancellation within five days after
 the date the exemption is canceled [he makes the cancellation].
 (q)  A chief appraiser may not cancel an exemption under
 Section 11.13 that is received by an individual who is 65 years of
 age or older without first providing written notice of the
 cancellation to the individual receiving the exemption. The notice
 must include a form on which the individual may indicate whether the
 individual is qualified to receive the exemption and a
 self-addressed postage prepaid envelope with instructions for
 returning the form to the chief appraiser. The chief appraiser
 shall consider the individual's response on the form in determining
 whether to continue to allow the exemption. If the chief appraiser
 does not receive a response on or before the 60th day after the date
 the notice is mailed, the chief appraiser may cancel the exemption
 on or after the 30th day after the expiration of the 60-day period,
 but only after making a reasonable effort to locate the individual
 and determine whether the individual is qualified to receive the
 exemption. For purposes of this subsection, sending an additional
 notice of cancellation that includes, in bold font equal to or
 greater in size than the surrounding text, the date on which the
 chief appraiser is authorized to cancel the exemption to the
 individual receiving the exemption immediately after the
 expiration of the 60-day period by first class mail in an envelope
 on which is written, in all capital letters, "RETURN SERVICE
 REQUESTED," or another appropriate statement directing the United
 States Postal Service to return the notice if it is not deliverable
 as addressed, or providing the additional notice in another manner
 that the chief appraiser determines is appropriate, constitutes a
 reasonable effort on the part of the chief appraiser. This
 subsection does not apply to an exemption under Section 11.13(c) or
 (d) for an individual 65 years of age or older that is canceled
 because the chief appraiser determines that the individual
 receiving the exemption no longer owns the property subject to the
 exemption.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an action taken by a chief appraiser to cancel a residence
 homestead exemption from ad valorem taxation that is received by an
 individual who is 65 years of age or older on or after the effective
 date of this Act. An action taken by a chief appraiser to cancel a
 residence homestead exemption from ad valorem taxation that is
 received by an individual who is 65 years of age or older before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the action was taken, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *