Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1474 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2015

                    By: VanDeaver, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 1474
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the placement of money in the state instructional
 materials fund and payment of the instructional materials
 allotment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 31.0211(a) and (d), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A school district is entitled to an [annual] allotment
 each biennium from the state instructional materials fund for each
 student enrolled in the district on a date during the last year of
 the preceding biennium [school year] specified by the
 commissioner.  The commissioner shall determine the amount of the
 allotment per student each biennium [year] on the basis of the
 amount of money available in the state instructional materials fund
 to fund the allotment.  An allotment under this section shall be
 transferred from the state instructional materials fund to the
 credit of the district's instructional materials account as
 provided by Section 31.0212.
 (d)  Each biennium [year] a school district shall use the
 district's allotment under this section to purchase, in the
 following order:
 (1)  instructional materials necessary to permit the
 district to certify that the district has instructional materials
 that cover all elements of the essential knowledge and skills of the
 required curriculum, other than physical education, for each grade
 level as required by Section 28.002; and
 (2)  any other instructional materials or
 technological equipment as determined by the district.
 SECTION 2.  Section 31.0212(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The commissioner shall maintain an instructional
 materials account for each school district. In the first year of
 each biennium [Each school year], the commissioner shall deposit in
 the account for each district the amount of the district's
 instructional materials allotment under Section 31.0211.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 31.0215(a) and (b), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commissioner shall, as early as practicable during
 each biennium [fiscal year], notify each school district and
 open-enrollment charter school of the estimated amount to which the
 district or charter school will be entitled under Section 31.0211
 during the next fiscal biennium [year].
 (b)  The commissioner may allow a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school to place an order for instructional
 materials before the beginning of a fiscal biennium [year] and to
 receive instructional materials before payment.  The commissioner
 shall limit the cost of an order placed under this section to 80
 percent of the estimated amount to which a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school is estimated to be entitled as
 provided by Subsection (a) and shall first credit any balance in a
 district or charter school instructional materials account to pay
 for an order placed under this section.
 SECTION 4.  Section 43.001(d), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  Each biennium [year] the State Board of Education shall
 set aside an amount equal to 50 percent of the [annual] distribution
 for that biennium [year] from the permanent school fund to the
 available school fund as provided by Section 5(a), Article VII,
 Texas Constitution, to be placed, subject to the General
 Appropriations Act, in the state instructional materials fund
 established under Section 31.021.
 SECTION 5.  Section 403.093(d), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d)  The comptroller shall transfer from the general revenue
 fund to the foundation school fund an amount of money necessary to
 fund the foundation school program as provided by Chapter 42,
 Education Code. The comptroller shall make the transfers in
 installments as necessary to comply with Section 42.259, Education
 Code, and permit the Texas Education Agency, to the extent
 authorized by the General Appropriations Act, to make temporary
 transfers from the foundation school fund for payment of the
 instructional materials allotment under Section 31.0211, Education
 Code. Unless an earlier date is necessary for purposes of temporary
 transfers for payment of the instructional materials allotment, an
 [An] installment must be made not earlier than two days before the
 date an installment to school districts is required by Section
 42.259, Education Code, and must not exceed the amount necessary
 for that payment and any temporary transfers for payment of the
 instructional materials allotment.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *