Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1504 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 20, 2015      TO: Honorable Wayne Smith, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1504 by Canales (Relating to a lottery prize winner's choice to remain anonymous on authorization to withhold five percent of winnings.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1504, As Introduced: a positive impact of $596,772 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 20, 2015





  TO: Honorable Wayne Smith, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1504 by Canales (Relating to a lottery prize winner's choice to remain anonymous on authorization to withhold five percent of winnings.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Wayne Smith, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1504 by Canales (Relating to a lottery prize winner's choice to remain anonymous on authorization to withhold five percent of winnings.), As Introduced

 Honorable Wayne Smith, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures 

 Honorable Wayne Smith, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1504 by Canales (Relating to a lottery prize winner's choice to remain anonymous on authorization to withhold five percent of winnings.), As Introduced

HB1504 by Canales (Relating to a lottery prize winner's choice to remain anonymous on authorization to withhold five percent of winnings.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1504, As Introduced: a positive impact of $596,772 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1504, As Introduced: a positive impact of $596,772 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2016 $298,386   2017 $298,386   2018 $298,386   2019 $298,386   2020 $298,386    


2016 $298,386
2017 $298,386
2018 $298,386
2019 $298,386
2020 $298,386

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromFoundation School Fund193    2016 $298,386   2017 $298,386   2018 $298,386   2019 $298,386   2020 $298,386   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromFoundation School Fund193    2016 $298,386   2017 $298,386   2018 $298,386   2019 $298,386   2020 $298,386  


2016 $298,386
2017 $298,386
2018 $298,386
2019 $298,386
2020 $298,386

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Government Code relating to a lottery prize winner's choice to remain anonymous on authorization to withhold five percent of winnings.The bill would direct the Lottery Commission to adopt rules governing nondisclosure of the identity of certain lottery prize winners.  The bill would allow a lottery prize winner to remain anonymous if the prize amount is over $1.0 million and the winner authorizes five percent of the prize amount to be withheld and be deposited to the credit of General Revenue-Dedicated Account 5025 (GR-D 5025).The bill takes effect September 1, 2015; however, the provisions of the bill would only apply to lottery prize winners that submit a claim for a lottery prize on or after January 1, 2016. 

Methodology

Based on information provided by the Texas Lottery Commission and the Comptroller of Public Accounts, this analysis assumes an annual average of $198.9 million in prizes paid where the prizes were valued at over $1.0 million.  It is also assumed that approximately three percent of those prize winnings ($5.97 million) would be subject to prize winners opting to remain anonymous and have five percent of their prize winnings withheld ($298,386).  The bill would result in an annual revenue gain of $298,386 to GR-D 5025, which would then be transferred to the Foundation School Fund 193.  This legislation would create or recreate a dedicated account in the General Revenue Fund, create or recreate a special or trust fund either with or outside of the Treasury, or create a dedicated revenue source.  The fund, account, or revenue dedication included in this bill would be subject to funds consolidation review by the current Legislature.Based on information provided by the Texas Lottery Commission, it is further assumed that all duties and responsibilities necessary to implement the provisions of the bill could be accomplished utilizing existing staff and resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 362 Texas Lottery Commission

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 362 Texas Lottery Commission

LBB Staff: UP, CL, NV, ER

 UP, CL, NV, ER