Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1546 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Allen (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 1546
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 11, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 11, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1546 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the award of diligent participation credit to
 defendants confined in a state jail felony facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 42, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 42.0199 to read as follows:
 Art. 42.0199.  FINDING REGARDING DILIGENT PARTICIPATION
 CREDIT. If a person is convicted of a state jail felony, the judge
 shall make a finding and enter the finding in the judgment of the
 case regarding whether the person is presumptively entitled to
 diligent participation credit in accordance with Section 15(h),
 Article 42.12.
 SECTION 2.  Section 15(h), Article 42.12, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by amending Subdivisions (1), (5), and (6)
 and adding Subdivisions (7) and (8) to read as follows:
 (1)  A defendant confined in a state jail felony
 facility does not earn good conduct time for time served in the
 facility but may be awarded diligent participation credit in
 accordance with Subdivision (6) or (7).
 (5)  For a defendant who has participated in an
 educational, vocational, treatment, or work program while confined
 in a state jail felony facility, [not later than the 30th day before
 the date on which the defendant will have served 80 percent of the
 defendant's sentence,] the Texas Department of Criminal Justice
 shall record [report to the sentencing court] the number of days
 during which the defendant diligently participated in any
 educational, vocational, treatment, or work program. [The contents
 of a report submitted under this subdivision are not subject to
 challenge by a defendant.]
 (6)  For a defendant with a judgment that contains a
 finding under Article 42.0199 that the defendant is presumptively
 entitled to diligent participation credit and who has not been the
 subject of disciplinary action while confined in the state jail
 felony facility, the department shall [A judge, based on the report
 received under Subdivision (5), may] credit against any time the
 [a] defendant is required to serve in a state jail felony facility
 additional time for each day the defendant actually served in the
 facility while diligently participating in an educational,
 vocational, treatment, or work program.
 (7)  For a defendant with a judgment that contains a
 finding under Article 42.0199 that the defendant is not
 presumptively entitled to diligent participation credit or who has
 been the subject of disciplinary action while confined in the state
 jail felony facility, the department shall, not later than the 30th
 day before the date on which the defendant will have served 80
 percent of the defendant's sentence, report to the sentencing court
 the record of the number of days under Subdivision (5). The contents
 of a report submitted under this subdivision are not subject to
 challenge by a defendant. A judge, based on the report, may credit
 against any time a defendant is required to serve in a state jail
 felony facility additional time for each day the defendant actually
 served in the facility while diligently participating in an
 educational, vocational, treatment, or work program.
 (8)  A time credit under Subdivision (6) or (7) [this
 subdivision] may not exceed one-fifth of the amount of time the
 defendant is originally required to serve in the facility. A
 defendant may not be awarded a credit under Subdivision (6) or (7)
 [this subdivision] for any period during which the defendant is
 subject to disciplinary status [action]. A time credit under
 Subdivision (6) or (7) [this subdivision] is a privilege and not a
 right.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a person confined in a state jail felony facility for an offense
 committed on or after the effective date of this Act. A person
 confined in a state jail felony facility for an offense committed
 before the effective date of this Act is covered by the law in
 effect when the offense was committed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this section,
 an offense was committed before the effective date of this Act if
 any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *