Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1550 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zerwas, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 1550
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 15, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 SchwertnerX
 KolkhorstX
 CampbellX
 EstesX
 PerryX
 RodríguezX
 TaylorofCollinX
 UrestiX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of epinephrine by pharmacists.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 562, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 562.057 to read as follows:
 Sec. 562.057.  ADMINISTRATION OF EPINEPHRINE. (a) A
 pharmacist may administer epinephrine through an auto-injector
 device in accordance with this section.
 (b)  The board shall adopt rules designed to protect the
 public health and safety to implement this section. The rules must
 provide that a pharmacist may administer epinephrine through an
 auto-injector device to a patient in an emergency situation.
 (c)  A pharmacist may maintain, administer, and dispose of
 epinephrine auto-injector devices only in accordance with rules
 adopted by the board under this section.
 (d)  A pharmacist who administers epinephrine through an
 auto-injector device to a patient shall report the use to the
 patient's primary care physician, as identified by the patient, if
 the patient has a primary care physician.
 (e)  A pharmacist who in good faith administers epinephrine
 through an auto-injector device in accordance with the requirements
 of this section is not liable for civil damages for an act performed
 in the administration unless the act is wilfully or wantonly
 negligent. A pharmacist may not receive remuneration for the
 administration of epinephrine through an auto-injector device but
 may seek reimbursement for the cost of the epinephrine
 auto-injector device.
 (f)  The administration of epinephrine through an
 auto-injector device to a patient in accordance with the
 requirements of this section does not constitute the unlawful
 practice of any health care profession.
 SECTION 2.  Before January 1, 2016, pharmacists may
 administer epinephrine through an auto-injector device to the
 extent allowed under the law that exists before September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 (b)  Section 562.057, Occupations Code, as added by this Act,
 takes effect January 1, 2016, except that Section 562.057 takes
 effect September 1, 2015, for the limited purpose of allowing the
 Texas State Board of Pharmacy to adopt rules under that law that may
 take effect before January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *