Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1559 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2015

                    By: Parker, Minjarez H.B. No. 1559
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to public school Internet website information concerning
 local programs and services available to assist homeless students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 33, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 33.906 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.906.  WEBSITE INFORMATION CONCERNING LOCAL PROGRAMS
 AND SERVICES AVAILABLE TO ASSIST HOMELESS STUDENTS. (a) Except as
 provided by Subsection (e), each school that maintains an Internet
 website shall post on the website information regarding local
 programs and services, including charitable programs and services,
 available to assist homeless students.
 (b)  A school to which Subsection (a) applies shall make a
 good faith effort to compile information described by that
 subsection and shall post the information compiled in a format and
 style that is easily understandable by students or parents, as
 appropriate based on the grade levels the school offers.
 (c)  A representative of a local program or service available
 to assist homeless students may request to have information
 concerning the program or service posted on a school's website. A
 school may determine the information that is posted on the school's
 website and is not required to post information as requested by the
 representative.
 (d)  A school district is not liable for any harm to a student
 that results in connection with a local program or service referred
 to on the website of a district school as provided by this section.
 (e)  This section does not apply to a school within a school
 district that:
 (1)  has an enrollment of fewer than 3,000 students;
 and
 (2)  is primarily located in a county with a population
 of less than 50,000.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2015-2016
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *