Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB158 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Larson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 158
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NelsonX
 HinojosaX
 BettencourtX
 EltifeX
 HancockX
 HuffmanX
 KolkhorstX
 NicholsX
 SchwertnerX
 SeligerX
 Taylorof GalvestonX
 UrestiX
 WatsonX
 WestX
 WhitmireX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the allocation and use of the proceeds from taxes
 imposed on the sale, storage, or use of sporting goods.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 151.801(c) and (c-1), Tax Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The [Subject to Subsection (c-1), the] proceeds from the
 collection of the taxes imposed by this chapter on the sale,
 storage, or use of sporting goods shall be deposited as follows:
 (1)  an amount equal to 94 percent of the proceeds shall
 be credited to the Parks and Wildlife Department and deposited as
 specified in the Parks and Wildlife Code; and
 (2)  an amount equal to six percent of the proceeds
 shall be credited to the Texas Historical Commission and deposited
 as specified in Section 442.073, Government Code.
 (c-1)  Money credited to Parks and Wildlife Department
 accounts under Subsection (c) may be appropriated only:
 (1)  to acquire, operate, maintain, and make capital
 improvements to parks;
 (2)  for a purpose authorized under Chapter 24, Parks
 and Wildlife Code; and
 (3)  [Except as provided by this subsection, the
 comptroller may not credit to the Parks and Wildlife Department or
 the Texas Historical Commission any amounts under this section that
 are in excess of the amounts appropriated to the department or
 commission for that biennium.     In addition to amounts appropriated
 to the Parks and Wildlife Department from the proceeds described by
 Subsection (c), the comptroller shall transfer to appropriate
 department accounts amounts from those proceeds sufficient] to fund
 the state contributions for employee benefits of Parks and Wildlife
 Department employees whose salaries or wages are paid from those
 department accounts [receiving the transfers].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *