Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1583 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/24/2015

                    By: Clardy (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1583
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 24, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 24, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1583 By:  Bettencourt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to block scheduling for certain associate degree and
 certificate programs at public junior colleges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 130, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 130.0095 to read as follows:
 Sec. 130.0095.  BLOCK SCHEDULING FOR CERTAIN ASSOCIATE
 DEGREE OR CERTIFICATE PROGRAM. (a) To facilitate timely degree
 completion by students at public junior colleges, from among the
 allied health, nursing, and career and technology associate degree
 or certificate programs offered by a public junior college, the
 college shall establish, for at least five of those programs not
 previously offered as a block schedule curriculum, a block schedule
 curriculum under which:
 (1)  courses required for a student's enrollment in the
 program as a full-time student are offered each semester in
 scheduled blocks, such as a morning, full-day, afternoon, evening,
 or weekend block schedule, designed to provide scheduling
 predictability from semester to semester to students enrolled in
 the program; and
 (2)  students may enroll in an entire block schedule
 curriculum offered under the program in a semester, rather than
 enrolling in individual courses leading toward the degree or
 certificate.
 (b)  Each public junior college shall publish in advance of
 each semester the available block schedule curricula for each
 associate degree or certificate program described by Subsection (a)
 offered by the college for that semester.
 (c)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board, in
 consultation with public junior colleges, shall adopt rules as
 necessary for the administration of this section, including rules
 prescribing a process by which a public junior college may petition
 the coordinating board for an exception to the number of programs
 for which a block schedule curriculum is required by Subsection (a)
 on demonstration of hardship.
 (d)  Not later than November 1, 2018, the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board shall submit to the governor and
 legislature a detailed report on the effectiveness of block
 scheduling under this section and any related recommendations for
 legislative or other action.
 (e)  This section expires August 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  Section 130.0095, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies beginning with the 2016 fall semester.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *