H.B. No. 1583 AN ACT relating to block scheduling for certain associate degree and certificate programs at public junior colleges. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE O F TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 130, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 130.0095 to read as follows: Sec. 130.0095. BLOCK SCHEDULING FOR CERTAIN ASSOCIATE DEGREE OR CERTIFICATE PROGRAM. (a) To facilitate timely degree completion by students at public junior colleges, from among the allied health, nursing, and career and technology associate degree or certificate programs offered by a public junior college, the college shall establish, for at least five of those programs not previously offered as a block schedule curriculum, a block schedule curriculum under which: (1) courses required for a student's enrollment in the program as a full-time student are offered each semester in scheduled blocks, such as a morning, full-day, afternoon, evening, or weekend block schedule, designed to provide scheduling predictability from semester to semester to students enrolled in the program; and (2) students may enroll in an entire block schedule curriculum offered under the program in a semester, rather than enrolling in individual courses leading toward the degree or certificate. (b) Each public junior college shall publish in advance of each semester the available block schedule curricula for each associate degree or certificate program described by Subsection (a) offered by the college for that semester. (c) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board, in consultation with public junior colleges, shall adopt rules as necessary for the administration of this section, including rules prescribing a process by which a public junior college may petition the coordinating board for an exception to the number of programs for which a block schedule curriculum is required by Subsection (a) on demonstration of hardship. (d) Not later than November 1, 2018, the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall submit to the governor and legislature a detailed report on the effectiveness of block scheduling under this section and any related recommendations for legislative or other action. (e) This section expires August 1, 2019. SECTION 2. Section 130.0095, Education Code, as added by this Act, applies beginning with the 2016 fall semester. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1583 was passed by the House on April 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 2, 1 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 1583 on May 29, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1583 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor