Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1585 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/31/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1585


 AN ACT
 relating to the use of hotel occupancy tax revenue in certain
 municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 351.101, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (j) to read as follows:
 (j)  In addition to the purposes provided by Subsection (a),
 a municipality that has a population of not more than 5,000 and at
 least part of which is located less than one-eighth of one mile from
 a space center operated by an agency of the federal government may
 use revenue from the municipal hotel occupancy tax for expenses,
 including promotion expenses, directly related to a sporting event
 in which the majority of participants are tourists who
 substantially increase economic activity at hotels and motels
 within the municipality or its vicinity.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 351, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 351.1071 to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.1071.  ALLOCATION OF REVENUE: CERTAIN
 MUNICIPALITIES. (a)  This section applies only to a municipality:
 (1)  that has a population of not more than 5,000; and
 (2)  at least part of which is located less than
 one-eighth of one mile from a space center operated by an agency of
 the federal government.
 (b)  In this section, "authorized facility" means a civic
 center, marina, meeting room, hotel, parking facility, or visitor
 center, including signage related to the facility, that:
 (1)  is owned by the municipality or a nonprofit
 corporation acting on behalf of the municipality;
 (2)  is located not more than 1,000 feet from a hotel
 property in the municipality; and
 (3)  substantially enhances hotel activity and
 encourages tourism within the municipality.
 (c)  Subject to Subsection (d) and notwithstanding any other
 provision of this chapter, a municipality to which this section
 applies may use the amount of revenue derived from the application
 of the tax under this chapter at a rate of three percent of the price
 paid for a room in a hotel to:
 (1)  establish, acquire, purchase, construct, improve,
 maintain, or operate an authorized facility; and
 (2)  pay bonds issued for a purpose described by
 Subdivision (1).
 (d)  A municipality may not use municipal hotel occupancy tax
 revenue on an authorized facility in a total amount that would
 exceed the amount of hotel revenue attributable to events at that
 facility for the 15-year period following the completion of
 construction.
 (e)  A municipality that uses municipal hotel occupancy tax
 revenue for a purpose authorized by this section shall publish
 annually for the 15-year period following the completion of
 construction at the authorized facility for which the revenue was
 used a report on the Internet website of the municipality that
 lists:
 (1)  for the preceding year, the events held at the
 authorized facility with respect to which the tax revenue was used
 and the number of hotel room nights attributable to those events;
 and
 (2)  the amount of hotel revenue and municipal hotel
 occupancy tax revenue attributable to events held at the authorized
 facility in that year.
 (f)  If a municipality uses municipal hotel occupancy tax
 revenue to establish, acquire, purchase, construct, or improve an
 authorized facility, the municipality shall, on the 5th, 10th, and
 15th anniversaries of the completion of construction at the
 facility:
 (1)  calculate:
 (A)  the sum of:
 (i)  municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue
 used to maintain or operate the facility in the past five years;
 (ii)  one-third of the amount of municipal
 hotel occupancy tax revenue used to establish, acquire, purchase,
 construct, or improve the authorized facility; and
 (iii)  any credits carried over from a
 previous five-year period, as authorized by Subsection (g); and
 (B)  hotel revenue directly attributable to
 events held at the authorized facility in the past five years; and
 (2)  if the amount calculated under Subdivision (1)(A)
 exceeds the amount calculated under Subdivision (1)(B), reimburse
 the municipality's hotel occupancy tax revenue fund from the
 municipality's general fund in the amount of the difference.
 (g)  If, for a given five-year period, the amount calculated
 under Subsection (f)(1)(B) exceeds the amount calculated under
 Subsection (f)(1)(A), the municipality may carry forward the
 difference to be used as a credit in a subsequent five-year period.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1585 was passed by the House on May
 15, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 118, Nays 21, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1585 on May 28, 2015, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1585 on May 31, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 99,
 Nays 44, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1585 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays
 2; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1585 on May 30, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 28, Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor