Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1598 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2015

                    By: Miller of Comal (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 1598
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 15, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 CampbellX
 BurtonX
 BirdwellX
 GarciaX
 HallX
 LucioX
 RodríguezX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas military forces oath of affirmation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 437.205(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  A person appointed, enlisted, or drafted in the Texas
 military forces or who volunteers for the Texas military forces
 shall take and subscribe to the following [an] oath:
 "I, __________, do solemnly swear that I will bear true faith
 and allegiance to the State of Texas and to the United States of
 America, that I will serve this state and nation honestly and
 faithfully against all enemies, and that I will obey the orders of
 the governor of Texas and of the officers appointed over me, in
 accordance with the laws, rules, and articles governing the
 military forces of the State of Texas." [prescribed by the adjutant
 general.]
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *