Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1613 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 1613
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1613 By:  Menéndez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the alignment of college readiness standards and
 expectations and essential knowledge and skills and the use to
 satisfy requirements concerning high school end-of-course
 assessment instruments of performance demonstrating satisfaction
 of certain college readiness benchmarks on certain assessment
 instruments designated by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.008(d), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  The State Board of Education shall incorporate college
 readiness standards and expectations approved by the commissioner
 of education and the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 under Subsection (b) into the essential knowledge and skills
 identified by the board under Section 28.002(c). The State Board of
 Education shall develop and by rule adopt a chart that clearly
 indicates the alignment of the college readiness standards and
 expectations with the essential knowledge and skills identified by
 the board under Section 28.002(c).
 SECTION 2.  Section 39.025, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a-1) and adding Subsection (a-2) to read as
 follows:
 (a-1)  A student enrolled in a college preparatory
 mathematics or English language arts course under Section 28.014
 who satisfies the Texas Success Initiative (TSI) college readiness
 benchmarks prescribed by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board under Section 51.3062(f) on an assessment instrument
 designated by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board under
 Section 51.3062(c) administered at the end of the college
 preparatory mathematics or English language arts course satisfies
 the requirements concerning and is exempt from the administration
 of the Algebra I or the English I and English II [an] end-of-course
 assessment instruments, as applicable, [in an equivalent course] as
 prescribed by Section 39.023(c), even if the student did not
 perform satisfactorily on a previous administration of the
 applicable end-of-course assessment instrument [Subsection (a)]. A
 student who fails to perform satisfactorily on the assessment
 instrument designated by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board under Section 51.3062(c) administered as provided by this
 subsection may retake that assessment instrument for purposes of
 this subsection or may take the appropriate end-of-course
 assessment instrument.
 (a-2)  The commissioner shall determine a method by which a
 student's satisfactory performance on an advanced placement test,
 an international baccalaureate examination, an SAT Subject Test,
 the SAT, the ACT, or any nationally recognized norm-referenced
 assessment instrument used by institutions of higher education to
 award course credit based on satisfactory performance on the
 assessment instrument shall be used to satisfy the requirements
 concerning an end-of-course assessment instrument in an equivalent
 course as prescribed by Subsection (a).  The commissioner shall
 determine a method by which a student's satisfactory performance on
 the PSAT or the ACT-Plan shall be used to satisfy the requirements
 concerning an end-of-course assessment instrument in an equivalent
 course as prescribed by Subsection (a).  A student who fails to
 perform satisfactorily on a test or other assessment instrument
 authorized under this subsection, other than the PSAT or the
 ACT-Plan, may retake that test or other assessment instrument for
 purposes of this subsection or may take the appropriate
 end-of-course assessment instrument.  A student who fails to
 perform satisfactorily on the PSAT or the ACT-Plan must take the
 appropriate end-of-course assessment instrument.  The commissioner
 shall adopt rules as necessary for the administration of this
 subsection.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the State Board
 of Education shall adopt a chart as prescribed by Section
 28.008(d), Education Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *