H.B. No. 1613 AN ACT relating to the alignment of college readiness standards and expectations and essential knowledge and skills and the use to satisfy requirements concerning high school end-of-course assessment instruments of performance demonstrating satisfaction of certain college readiness benchmarks on certain assessment instruments designated by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 28.008(d), Education Code, is amended to read as follows: (d) The State Board of Education shall incorporate college readiness standards and expectations approved by the commissioner of education and the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board under Subsection (b) into the essential knowledge and skills identified by the board under Section 28.002(c). The State Board of Education shall develop and by rule adopt a chart that clearly indicates the alignment of the college readiness standards and expectations with the essential knowledge and skills identified by the board under Section 28.002(c). SECTION 2. Section 39.025, Education Code, is amended by amending Subsection (a-1) and adding Subsection (a-2) to read as follows: (a-1) A student enrolled in a college preparatory mathematics or English language arts course under Section 28.014 who satisfies the Texas Success Initiative (TSI) college readiness benchmarks prescribed by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board under Section 51.3062(f) on an assessment instrument designated by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board under Section 51.3062(c) administered at the end of the college preparatory mathematics or English language arts course satisfies the requirements concerning and is exempt from the administration of the Algebra I or the English I and English II [an] end-of-course assessment instruments, as applicable, [in an equivalent course] as prescribed by Section 39.023(c), even if the student did not perform satisfactorily on a previous administration of the applicable end-of-course assessment instrument [Subsection (a)]. A student who fails to perform satisfactorily on the assessment instrument designated by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board under Section 51.3062(c) administered as provided by this subsection may retake that assessment instrument for purposes of this subsection or may take the appropriate end-of-course assessment instrument. (a-2) The commissioner shall determine a method by which a student's satisfactory performance on an advanced placement test, an international baccalaureate examination, an SAT Subject Test, the SAT, the ACT, or any nationally recognized norm-referenced assessment instrument used by institutions of higher education to award course credit based on satisfactory performance on the assessment instrument shall be used to satisfy the requirements concerning an end-of-course assessment instrument in an equivalent course as prescribed by Subsection (a). The commissioner shall determine a method by which a student's satisfactory performance on the PSAT or the ACT-Plan shall be used to satisfy the requirements concerning an end-of-course assessment instrument in an equivalent course as prescribed by Subsection (a). A student who fails to perform satisfactorily on a test or other assessment instrument authorized under this subsection, other than the PSAT or the ACT-Plan, may retake that test or other assessment instrument for purposes of this subsection or may take the appropriate end-of-course assessment instrument. A student who fails to perform satisfactorily on the PSAT or the ACT-Plan must take the appropriate end-of-course assessment instrument. The commissioner shall adopt rules as necessary for the administration of this subsection. SECTION 3. Not later than January 1, 2016, the State Board of Education shall adopt a chart as prescribed by Section 28.008(d), Education Code, as amended by this Act. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1613 was passed by the House on May 8, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 1, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 1613 on May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 1, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1613 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 24, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor