Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB163 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/10/2014

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R266 JAM-D
 By: Larson H.B. No. 163


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to interstate cooperation to address regional water
 issues.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Chapter 8, Water Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 8. SOUTHWESTERN STATES WATER [MULTI-STATE WATER RESOURCES
 PLANNING] COMMISSION
 SECTION 2.  Section 8.001(1), Water Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Southwestern States Water
 [Multi-State Water Resources Planning] Commission.
 SECTION 3.  Section 8.011, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8.011.  CREATION OF COMMISSION. The Southwestern
 States Water [Multi-State Water Resources Planning] Commission is
 created as an advisory commission to the governor and the
 legislature [agency of the state].
 SECTION 4.  Section 8.013, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8.013.  COMMISSIONERS [MEMBERS OF COMMISSION];
 APPOINTMENT. [(a)]  The commission is composed of six [seven]
 commissioners.  Two commissioners [who] are appointed by the
 governor, two commissioners are appointed by the lieutenant
 governor, and two commissioners are appointed by the speaker of the
 house of representatives [with the advice and consent of the
 senate].
 [(b)     The governor shall make the appointments so that each
 member is from a different section of the state.
 [(c)     Three commissioners must be members of the general
 public, one commissioner must have a background in the field of
 higher education, one commissioner must have a background in
 private business, one commissioner must have a background in
 agriculture, and one commissioner must have a background in an
 energy-related field.]
 SECTION 5.  Section 8.015, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8.015.  TERMS [OF OFFICE]. (a) Commissioners serve
 [hold office] for staggered terms of six years, with the terms of
 two or three commissioners expiring on February 1 of each
 odd-numbered year.
 (b)  Each commissioner serves [holds office] until the
 commissioner's [his] successor is appointed [and has qualified for
 office].
 (c)  A [If a] vacancy on the commission [occurs in the office
 of commissioner, the governor] shall be filled [appoint a successor
 to serve] for the unexpired portion of the term in the same manner
 as the original appointment.
 SECTION 6.  Section 8.019, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8.019.  ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT [STAFF]. The board
 shall provide administrative [necessary staff and] support to the
 commission to assist the commission in carrying out this chapter.
 SECTION 7.  Section 8.051, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8.051.  INTERACTION WITH OTHER STATES. (a) In
 cooperation with representatives of neighboring states, the
 commission may discuss [shall study] the water needs of the region
 [after the year 2000].
 (b)  The commission may [shall] initiate and carry out
 discussions with representatives of neighboring states relating to
 the identification and development of sources and methods of
 augmenting water supplies on a regional basis after existing water
 supplies are fully committed.
 SECTION 8.  Section 8.052, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8.052.  INTERACTION WITH MEXICO. The commission may
 [shall contract and] confer with the government of Mexico
 concerning water needs and development of sources of water supply.
 SECTION 9.  Section 8.056, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8.056.  COMPACTS. The commission may [shall] contact
 and negotiate with other states regarding the need for establishing
 interstate compacts, addressing groundwater problems, needs, and
 supplies, if an aquifer underlies several states, and addressing
 other related subjects that would be beneficial to the states
 including the conservation and beneficial use of water.
 SECTION 10.  Sections 8.014, 8.018, and 8.053, Water Code,
 are repealed.
 SECTION 11.  (a)  Promptly after this Act takes effect, the
 governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of
 representatives shall appoint the initial members of the
 Southwestern States Water Commission under Chapter 8, Water Code,
 as amended by this Act.
 (b)  In appointing the initial members of the commission:
 (1)  the governor shall appoint one person to a term
 expiring February 1, 2017, and one person to a term expiring
 February 1, 2019;
 (2)  the lieutenant governor shall appoint one person
 to a term expiring February 1, 2017, and one person to a term
 expiring February 1, 2021; and
 (3)  the speaker of the house of representatives shall
 appoint one person to a term expiring February 1, 2019, and one
 person to a term expiring February 1, 2021.
 SECTION 12.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.