Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB163 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/22/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 163


 AN ACT
 relating to interstate cooperation to address regional water
 issues.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Chapter 8, Water Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 8. SOUTHWESTERN STATES WATER [MULTI-STATE WATER RESOURCES
 PLANNING] COMMISSION
 SECTION 2.  Section 8.001(1), Water Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Southwestern States Water
 [Multi-State Water Resources Planning] Commission.
 SECTION 3.  Section 8.011, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8.011.  CREATION OF COMMISSION. The Southwestern
 States Water [Multi-State Water Resources Planning] Commission is
 created as an advisory commission to the governor and the
 legislature [agency of the state].
 SECTION 4.  Section 8.013, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8.013.  COMMISSIONERS  [MEMBERS OF COMMISSION];
 APPOINTMENT. (a) The commission is composed of three [seven]
 commissioners as follows:
 (1)  [who are appointed by] the governor or the
 governor's designee;
 (2)  a member of the standing committee of the house of
 representatives that has jurisdiction over natural resources,
 appointed by the governor; and
 (3)  a member of the standing committee [with the
 advice and consent] of the senate that has jurisdiction over water
 issues, appointed by the governor.
 (b)  The governor or the governor's designee shall act as the
 official representative of this state on the commission and shall
 exercise all powers and duties of this state as a member of the
 commission [make the appointments so that each member is from a
 different section of the state].
 [(c)     Three commissioners must be members of the general
 public, one commissioner must have a background in the field of
 higher education, one commissioner must have a background in
 private business, one commissioner must have a background in
 agriculture, and one commissioner must have a background in an
 energy-related field.]
 SECTION 5.  Section 8.015, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8.015.  TERMS [OF OFFICE]. (a) The two appointed
 commissioners serve [Commissioners hold office for] staggered
 terms of four [six] years, with the term [terms] of one appointed
 commissioner [two or three commissioners] expiring on February 1 of
 each odd-numbered year.
 (b)  Each appointed commissioner serves [holds office] until
 the commissioner's [his] successor is appointed [and has qualified
 for office].
 (c)  A [If a] vacancy in an appointed position on the
 commission [occurs in the office of commissioner, the governor]
 shall be filled [appoint a successor to serve] for the unexpired
 portion of the term in the same manner as the original appointment.
 SECTION 6.  Section 8.016, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8.016.  CHAIRMAN. The governor or the governor's
 designee shall serve [designate one commissioner] as chairman of
 the commission [to serve at the will of the governor].
 SECTION 7.  Section 8.017(c), Water Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (c)  The chairman or two commissioners may call a special
 meeting at any time by giving notice to the other commissioner or
 commissioners.
 SECTION 8.  Section 8.019, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8.019.  ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT [STAFF]. The board
 shall provide administrative [necessary staff and] support to the
 commission to assist the commission in carrying out this chapter.
 SECTION 9.  Section 8.051, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8.051.  INTERACTION WITH OTHER STATES. (a) In
 cooperation with representatives of neighboring states, the
 commission may discuss [shall study] the water needs of the region
 [after the year 2000].
 (b)  The commission may [shall] initiate and carry out
 discussions with representatives of neighboring states relating to
 the identification and development of sources and methods of
 augmenting water supplies on a regional basis after existing water
 supplies are fully committed.
 SECTION 10.  Section 8.052, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8.052.  INTERACTION WITH MEXICO. The commission may
 [shall contract and] confer with the government of Mexico
 concerning water needs and development of sources of water supply.
 SECTION 11.  Section 8.056, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8.056.  COMPACTS. The commission may [shall] contact
 and negotiate with other states regarding the need for establishing
 interstate compacts, addressing groundwater problems, needs, and
 supplies, if an aquifer underlies several states, and addressing
 other related subjects that would be beneficial to the states
 including the conservation and beneficial use of water.
 SECTION 12.  Sections 8.014, 8.018, and 8.053, Water Code,
 are repealed.
 SECTION 13.  (a)  Promptly after this Act takes effect, the
 governor shall appoint the initial appointed members of the
 Southwestern States Water Commission under Chapter 8, Water Code,
 as amended by this Act.
 (b)  In appointing the initial appointed members of the
 commission, the governor shall appoint one person to a term
 expiring February 1, 2017, and one person to a term expiring
 February 1, 2019.
 SECTION 14.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 163 was passed by the House on April
 16, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 163 on May 21, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 0, 2
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 163 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor