Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1679 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Raymond, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1679
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2015;
 April 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 6, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation of the Texas Council for Developmental
 Disabilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 112.023, Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 112.023.  SUNSET PROVISION.  The Texas Council for
 Developmental Disabilities is subject to Chapter 325, Government
 Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided
 by that chapter, the council is abolished and this chapter expires
 September 1, 2027 [2015].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *