By: Raymond, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1679 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2015; April 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; May 6, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the continuation of the Texas Council for Developmental Disabilities. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 112.023, Human Resources Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 112.023. SUNSET PROVISION. The Texas Council for Developmental Disabilities is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the council is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2027 [2015]. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *