Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1702 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2015

                    By: Blanco, Aycock (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 1702
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the elimination of the fee for the Gold Star mother,
 father, spouse, or family member specialty license plate.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.512(b), Transportation Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *