Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1736 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R22015 JXC-F
 By: Villalba, Oliveira H.B. No. 1736
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1736:
 By:  Simmons C.S.H.B. No. 1736


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to building energy efficiency performance standards.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 388.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a), (b), (b-2), (b-3), (d), and
 (i) and adding Subsections (j) and (k) to read as follows:
 (a)  To achieve energy conservation in single-family
 residential construction, the energy efficiency chapter of the
 International Residential Code, as it existed on May 1, 2001, is
 adopted as the energy code in this state for single-family
 residential construction. On September 1, 2016, the energy
 efficiency chapter of the International Residential Code, as it
 existed on May 1, 2015, is adopted as the energy code in this state
 for single-family residential construction. On or after September
 1, 2021, the State Energy Conservation Office may adopt and
 substitute for that energy code the latest published edition of the
 energy efficiency chapter of the International Residential Code,
 based on written findings on the stringency of the chapter
 submitted by the laboratory under Subsection (b-3). The office:
 (1)  may not adopt an edition under this subsection
 more often than once every six years; and
 (2)  by rule shall establish an effective date for an
 adopted edition that is not earlier than nine months after the date
 of adoption.
 (b)  To achieve energy conservation in all other
 residential, commercial, and industrial construction, the
 International Energy Conservation Code as it existed on May 1,
 2001, is adopted as the energy code for use in this state for all
 other residential, commercial, and industrial construction. The
 State Energy Conservation Office may adopt and substitute for that
 energy code the latest published edition of the International
 Energy Conservation Code, based on written findings on the
 stringency of the edition submitted by the laboratory under
 Subsection (b-3). The office by rule shall establish an effective
 date for an adopted edition that is not earlier than nine months
 after the date of adoption.
 (b-2)  The State Energy Conservation Office by rule shall
 establish a procedure for persons who have an interest in the
 adoption of energy codes under Subsection (a) or (b) [(b-1)] to have
 an opportunity to comment on the codes under consideration.  The
 office shall consider persons who have an interest in adoption of
 those codes to include:
 (1)  commercial and residential builders, architects,
 and engineers;
 (2)  municipal, county, and other local government
 authorities; [and]
 (3)  environmental groups; and
 (4)  manufacturers of building materials and products.
 (b-3)  The [In developing written recommendations under
 Subsection (b-1), the] laboratory shall:
 (1)  submit to the State Energy Conservation Office
 written findings on the stringency of the latest published edition
 of the International Residential Code energy efficiency provisions
 only if the date of the edition allows the office to adopt the
 edition under Subsection (a)(1);
 (2)  submit to the State Energy Conservation Office
 written findings on the stringency of the latest published edition
 of the International Energy Conservation Code not later than six
 months after publication of a new edition; and
 (3)  in developing the findings, consider the comments
 submitted under Subsection (b-2).
 (d)  A municipality [or county] may establish procedures to
 adopt local amendments to the International Energy Conservation
 Code and the energy efficiency chapter of the International
 Residential Code. Notwithstanding the requirements of Subsection
 (e), a municipality located in an area defined by Section
 388.002(11) or in an affected county may establish procedures to
 adopt local amendments to the energy rating index in an optional
 compliance path of an energy code adopted under this section.
 (i)  A building certified by a national, state, or local
 accredited energy efficiency program and determined by the
 laboratory to be in compliance with the energy efficiency
 requirements of this section may, at the option of the
 municipality, be considered in compliance. The United States
 Environmental Protection Agency's Energy Star Program
 certification of energy code equivalency shall be considered in
 compliance. An energy rating index in an optional compliance path
 of an energy code described by Subsection (j) shall be considered in
 compliance.
 (j)  For the purposes of this chapter, the Energy Rating
 Index used to measure compliance for single-family residential
 construction in an optional compliance path of an edition of the
 energy efficiency chapter of the International Residential Code
 that uses an energy rating index is as follows:
 (1)  for climate zone 2, an energy rating index of:
 (A)  65 or lower from September 1, 2016, to August
 31, 2019;
 (B)  63 or lower from September 1, 2019, to August
 31, 2022; and
 (C)  59 or lower on or after September 1, 2022;
 (2)  for climate zone 3, an energy rating index of:
 (A)  65 or lower from September 1, 2016, to August
 31, 2019;
 (B)  63 or lower from September 1, 2019, to August
 31, 2022; and
 (C)  59 or lower on or after September 1, 2022; and
 (3)  for climate zone 4, an energy rating index of:
 (A)  69 or lower from September 1, 2016, to August
 31, 2019;
 (B)  67 or lower from September 1, 2019, to August
 31, 2022; and
 (C)  63 or lower on or after September 1, 2022.
 (k)  This subsection and Subsection (j) expire September 1,
 2025.
 SECTION 2.  The following provisions of the Health and
 Safety Code are repealed:
 (1)  Section 388.003(b-1), as added by Chapter 262
 (S.B. 12), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007; and
 (2)  Section 388.003(b-1), as added by Chapter 939
 (H.B. 3693), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.