Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1781 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bonnen of Galveston, Miles, Sheets H.B. No. 1781
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HuffmanX
 EllisX
 BirdwellX
 CreightonX
 EstesX
 FraserX
 NelsonX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access by a sibling of a child separated from the
 sibling due to an action by the Department of Family and Protective
 Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 102.0045, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The sibling of a child who is separated from the
 sibling as the result of an action by the Department of Family and
 Protective Services may file an original suit as provided by
 Section 153.551 requesting access to the child, regardless of the
 age of the sibling. A court shall expedite a suit filed under this
 subsection.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *