Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1783 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Moody, Dale, Minjarez H.B. No. 1783
 (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the right of a school employee to report a crime and
 persons subject to the prohibition on coercing another into
 suppressing or failing to report information to a law enforcement
 agency; creating a criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.104(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  An open-enrollment charter school is subject to:
 (1)  a provision of this title establishing a criminal
 offense; and
 (2)  a prohibition, restriction, or requirement, as
 applicable, imposed by this title or a rule adopted under this
 title, relating to:
 (A)  the Public Education Information Management
 System (PEIMS) to the extent necessary to monitor compliance with
 this subchapter as determined by the commissioner;
 (B)  criminal history records under Subchapter C,
 Chapter 22;
 (C)  reading instruments and accelerated reading
 instruction programs under Section 28.006;
 (D)  accelerated instruction under Section
 28.0211;
 (E)  high school graduation requirements under
 Section 28.025;
 (F)  special education programs under Subchapter
 A, Chapter 29;
 (G)  bilingual education under Subchapter B,
 Chapter 29;
 (H)  prekindergarten programs under Subchapter E,
 Chapter 29;
 (I)  extracurricular activities under Section
 33.081;
 (J)  discipline management practices or behavior
 management techniques under Section 37.0021;
 (K)  health and safety under Chapter 38;
 (L)  public school accountability under
 Subchapters B, C, D, E, F, G, and J, Chapter 39;
 (M)  the requirement under Section 21.006 to
 report an educator's misconduct; [and]
 (N)  intensive programs of instruction under
 Section 28.0213; and
 (O)  the right of a school employee to report a
 crime, as provided by Section 37.148.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E-1, Chapter 37, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 37.148 to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.148.  RIGHT TO REPORT CRIME. (a) An employee of a
 school district or open-enrollment charter school may report a
 crime witnessed at the school to any peace officer with authority to
 investigate the crime.
 (b)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school may
 not adopt a policy requiring a school employee to:
 (1)  refrain from reporting a crime witnessed at the
 school; or
 (2)  report a crime witnessed at the school only to
 certain persons or peace officers.
 SECTION 3.  Section 39.06(a), Penal Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (a)  A public servant commits an offense if, in reliance on
 information to which the public servant [he] has access by virtue of
 the person's [his] office or employment and that has not been made
 public, the person [he]:
 (1)  acquires or aids another to acquire a pecuniary
 interest in any property, transaction, or enterprise that may be
 affected by the information;
 (2)  speculates or aids another to speculate on the
 basis of the information; or
 (3)  as a public servant, including as a [principal of
 a] school administrator, coerces another into suppressing or
 failing to report that information to a law enforcement agency.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 39.06, Penal Code, applies to an offense committed on or after the
 effective date of this Act. An offense committed before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the offense was committed, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose. For purposes of this section, an offense
 was committed before the effective date of this Act if any element
 of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *