Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB18 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Aycock (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 18
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 25, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 26, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 26, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to college and career readiness training for certain
 public school counselors and postsecondary advisors.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 33, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 33.009 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.009.  POSTSECONDARY EDUCATION AND CAREER COUNSELING
 ACADEMIES. (a) In this section, "center" means the Center for
 Teaching and Learning at The University of Texas at Austin.
 (b)  The center shall develop and make available
 postsecondary education and career counseling academies for school
 counselors and other postsecondary advisors employed by a school
 district at a middle school, junior high school, or high school.
 (c)  In developing academies under this section, the center
 shall solicit input from the agency, school counselors, the Texas
 Workforce Commission, institutions of higher education, and
 business, community, and school leaders.
 (d)  An academy developed under this section must provide
 counselors and other postsecondary advisors with knowledge and
 skills to provide counseling to students regarding postsecondary
 success and productive career planning and must include information
 relating to:
 (1)  each endorsement described by Section
 28.025(c-1), including:
 (A)  the course requirements for each
 endorsement; and
 (B)  the postsecondary educational and career
 opportunities associated with each endorsement;
 (2)  available methods for a student to earn credit for
 a course not offered at the school in which the student is enrolled,
 including enrollment in an electronic course provided through the
 state virtual school network under Chapter 30A;
 (3)  general academic performance requirements for
 admission to an institution of higher education, including the
 requirements for automatic admission to a general academic teaching
 institution under Section 51.803;
 (4)  regional workforce needs, including information
 about the required education and the average wage or salary for
 careers that meet those workforce needs; and
 (5)  effective strategies for engaging students and
 parents in planning for postsecondary education and potential
 careers, including participation in mentorships and business
 partnerships.
 (e)  From funds appropriated for that purpose, a school
 counselor who attends the academy under this section is entitled to
 receive a stipend in the amount determined by the center. A stipend
 received under this subsection is not considered in determining
 whether a district is paying the school counselor the minimum
 monthly salary under Section 21.402.
 (f)  From available funds appropriated for purposes of this
 section, the center may provide to school counselors and other
 educators curricula, instructional materials, and technological
 tools relating to postsecondary education and career counseling.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *