Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1819 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/12/2015

                    By: Miller of Comal (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 1819
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 12, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the date for the election of directors of the Hill
 Country Underground Water Conservation District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 8844.104, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8844.104.  ELECTION DATE.  Each odd-numbered
 [even-numbered] year, the board shall hold an election in the
 district on the uniform election date in May [November] to elect the
 appropriate number of directors.  Section 41.001(a)(2), Election
 Code, does not apply to the district.
 SECTION 2.  The board of directors of the Hill Country
 Underground Water Conservation District shall adjust the terms of
 office to conform to a change in the election date made by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *