Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1841 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2015

                    By: Bonnen of Galveston (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 1841
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of the sales and use tax to certain
 insurance services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 151.0039, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 151.0039.  "INSURANCE SERVICE". (a) Except as
 provided in Subsection (b), "insurance ["Insurance] service" means
 insurance loss or damage appraisal, insurance inspection,
 insurance investigation, insurance actuarial analysis or research,
 insurance claims adjustment or claims processing, or insurance loss
 prevention service.
 (b)  "Insurance service" does not include:
 (1)  insurance coverage for which a premium is paid or
 commissions paid to insurance agents for the sale of insurance or
 annuities;
 (2)  a service performed on behalf of an insured by a
 person licensed under Chapter 4102, Insurance Code; or
 (3)  a service provided by a person certified as a
 public accountant under Chapter 901, Occupations Code.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect taxes imposed before the effective date of this Act, and the
 law in effect before the effective date of this Act is continued in
 effect for purposes of the liability for and collection of those
 taxes.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect October 1, 2015.
 * * * * *