Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1888 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2015

                    By: Capriglione H.B. No. 1888
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1888 By:  Taylor of Collin


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 HuffinesX
 EllisX
 FraserX
 GarciaX
 HallX
 HancockX
 KolkhorstX
 TaylorofCollinX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to punishment for the offense of driving a commercial
 motor vehicle without a commercial driver's license; increasing a
 penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 522.011(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  An offense under this section is a [Class C] misdemeanor
 punishable by a fine not to exceed $500, except that the offense is
 a misdemeanor punishable by a fine not to exceed $1,000 if it is
 shown on the trial of the offense that the defendant was convicted
 of an offense under this section in the year preceding the date of
 the offense that is the subject of the trial.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *