Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB19 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: King of Taylor, Burkett H.B. No. 19
 (Senate Sponsor - Campbell)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 21, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 CampbellX
 BurtonX
 BirdwellX
 GarciaX
 HallX
 LucioX
 RodríguezX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a preventive services program and mental health
 programs for veterans and military families.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle E, Title 2, Human Resources Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 53 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 53. PREVENTIVE SERVICES FOR VETERANS AND MILITARY FAMILIES
 Sec. 53.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Department" means the Department of Family and
 Protective Services.
 (2)  "Veteran" means a person who has served in:
 (A)  the army, navy, air force, coast guard, or
 marine corps of the United States;
 (B)  the state military forces as defined by
 Section 431.001, Government Code; or
 (C)  an auxiliary service of one of those branches
 of the armed forces.
 Sec. 53.002.  VETERANS AND MILITARY FAMILIES PREVENTIVE
 SERVICES PROGRAM. (a) The department shall develop and implement a
 preventive services program to serve veterans and military families
 who have committed or experienced or who are at a high risk of:
 (1)  family violence; or
 (2)  abuse or neglect.
 (b)  The program must:
 (1)  be designed to coordinate with community-based
 organizations to provide prevention services;
 (2)  include a prevention component and an early
 intervention component;
 (3)  include collaboration with services for child
 welfare, services for early childhood education, and other child
 and family services programs; and
 (4)  coordinate with the community collaboration
 initiative developed under Subchapter I, Chapter 434, Government
 Code, and committees formed by local communities as part of that
 initiative.
 (c)  The program must be established initially as a pilot
 program in areas of the state in which the department considers the
 implementation practicable.  The department shall evaluate the
 outcomes of the pilot program and ensure that the program is
 producing positive results before implementing the program
 throughout the state.
 (d)  The department shall evaluate the program and prepare an
 annual report on the outcomes of the program. The department shall
 publish the report on the department's Internet website.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 434, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapters H and I to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER H. STATEWIDE COORDINATION OF MENTAL HEALTH
 PROGRAM FOR VETERANS
 Sec. 434.351.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Texas Veterans Commission.
 (2)  "Peer" means a person who is a veteran or a
 veteran's family member.
 (3)  "Veteran" means a person who has served in:
 (A)  the army, navy, air force, coast guard, or
 marine corps of the United States;
 (B)  the state military forces as defined by
 Section 431.001; or
 (C)  an auxiliary service of one of those branches
 of the armed forces.
 (4)  "Volunteer coordinator" means a person who
 recruits and retains veterans, peers, and volunteers to participate
 in the mental health program for veterans and related activities.
 Sec. 434.352.  DUTIES. (a) The commission and the
 Department of State Health Services shall coordinate to administer
 the mental health program for veterans developed under Chapter
 1001, Health and Safety Code.
 (b)  For the mental health program for veterans, the
 commission shall:
 (1)  provide training to volunteer coordinators and
 peers in accordance with Section 434.353;
 (2)  provide technical assistance to volunteer
 coordinators and peers;
 (3)  recruit, train, and communicate with
 community-based therapists, community-based organizations, and
 faith-based organizations; and
 (4)  coordinate services for justice involved
 veterans.
 (c)  The executive director of the commission shall appoint a
 program director to administer the mental health program for
 veterans.
 (d)  The commission shall provide appropriate facilities in
 support of the mental health program for veterans to the extent
 funding is available for that purpose.
 Sec. 434.353.  TRAINING AND CERTIFICATION. (a) The
 commission shall develop and implement methods for providing
 volunteer coordinator certification training to volunteer
 coordinators, including providing training for initial
 certification and recertification and providing continuing
 education.
 (b)  The commission shall manage and coordinate the peer
 training program to include initial training, advanced training,
 certification, and continuing education for peers associated with
 the mental health program for veterans.
 SUBCHAPTER I. COMMUNITY COLLABORATION INITIATIVE
 Sec. 434.401.  COMMUNITY COLLABORATION. (a) The commission
 and the Department of State Health Services shall include as a part
 of the mental health program for veterans described by Section
 434.352(a) an initiative to encourage local communities to conduct
 cross-sector collaboration to synchronize locally accessible
 resources available for veterans and military service members.
 (b)  The initiative must be designed to encourage local
 communities to form a committee that is tasked with developing a
 plan to identify and support the needs of veterans and military
 service members residing in their community. The commission may
 designate general areas of focus for the initiative.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *