Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1910 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/25/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R9431 GRM-D
 By: Howard H.B. No. 1910


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the secretary of state to conduct a study of
 the reasons for the rejection of early voting by mail ballots.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 31, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 31.013 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.013.  EARLY VOTING BY MAIL STUDY. (a)  Not later
 than December 31, 2015, the secretary of state shall, in
 consultation with each county election officer, as defined by
 Section 31.091, determine the method for gathering the following
 information by county for each primary and general election for
 state and county officers held in 2016:
 (1)  the number of early voting by mail ballots
 submitted, and the number of those voted as provided by Chapter 101
 by a member of the armed forces of the United States or the spouse or
 a dependent of a member;
 (2)  the number of early voting by mail ballots
 counted, and the number of those voted as provided by Chapter 101 by
 a member of the armed forces of the United States or the spouse or a
 dependent of a member; and
 (3)  the number of early voting by mail ballots
 rejected and the reason for the rejection, and the number of those
 voted as provided by Chapter 101 by a member of the armed forces of
 the United States or the spouse or a dependent of a member.
 (b)  Not later than June 30, 2017, the secretary of state
 shall issue a report to the appropriate standing committees of each
 house of the legislature that:
 (1)  includes the information gathered under
 Subsection (a);
 (2)  identifies any patterns regarding rejected early
 voting by mail ballots, including any patterns regarding rejected
 ballots voted as provided by Chapter 101 by a member of the armed
 forces of the United States or the spouse or a dependent of a
 member; and
 (3)  provides recommendations to the legislature
 concerning changes necessary to lower early voting by mail ballot
 rejection rates for all early voting by mail voters and for military
 voters, including recommended ballot format modifications.
 (c)  This section expires January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.