By: Elkins (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1912 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015; April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce; May 18, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 18, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1912 By: Whitmire A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to employment of a statewide data coordinator in the Department of Information Resources. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 2054, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 2054.0286 to read as follows: Sec. 2054.0286. STATEWIDE DATA COORDINATOR. (a) The executive director, using existing department funds, shall employ a statewide data coordinator to: (1) improve the control and security of information collected by state agencies; (2) promote between state agencies the sharing of information, including customer information; and (3) reduce information collection costs incurred by this state. (b) The statewide data coordinator shall develop and implement best practices among state agencies to: (1) improve interagency information coordination; (2) reduce duplicative information collection; (3) increase accountability and ensure compliance with statutes and rules requiring agencies to share information; (4) improve information management and analysis to increase information security, uncover fraud and waste, reduce agency costs, improve agency operations, and verify compliance with applicable laws; (5) encourage agencies to collect and post on the agencies' Internet websites information related to agency functions that is in an open file format and is machine-readable, exportable, and easily accessible by the public; and (6) encourage the evaluation of open document formats for storing data and documents generated by state agencies. (c) Each state agency shall cooperate with the statewide data coordinator in fulfilling the requirements of this section. (d) This section expires September 1, 2021. SECTION 2. As soon as practicable after the effective date of this Act, the executive director of the Department of Information Resources shall employ a statewide data coordinator as required by Section 2054.0286, Government Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *